Global patent index - EP 1004844 A1

EP 1004844 A1 2000-05-31 - Reactive armour device for a vehicle or structure

Title (en)

Reactive armour device for a vehicle or structure

Title (de)

Aktivschutzvorrichtung für Fahrzeuge oder Strukturen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection active d'une paroi de véhiule ou de structure

Publication

EP 1004844 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402750 A

Priority

FR 9814748 A

Abstract (en)

The panel comprises charge (4) placed around the periphery of the panel assembly. The inner section of the panel comprises conductive panels (17) that, upon impact of a projectile initiate an electrical arming and firing sequence of the explosive charges.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un dispositif de protection active d'une paroi, notamment d'une paroi d'un véhicule. Ce dispositif comprend au moins un boîtier (1) renfermant au moins quatre charges formées (4) ayant une direction d'action sensiblement parallèle ou bien inclinée par rapport à la paroi (2) du véhicule ainsi que des moyens de détection (16) assurant le déclenchement de la charge formée en réponse à l'arrivée d'un projectile. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 5/007

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/007 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004844 A1 20000531; EP 1004844 B1 20030903; DE 69910953 D1 20031009; DE 69910953 T2 20040519; FR 2786262 A1 20000526; FR 2786262 B1 20011019; US 6327955 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2005-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2003-10-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910953

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KERDRAON, ALAIN

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOUSSIROT, JEAN PAUL

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VIVES, MICHEL

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEFEBVRE, GERALD

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI