Global Patent Index - EP 1004892 A1

EP 1004892 A1 2000-05-31 - Compensating an MRI system for residual magnetization

Title (en)

Compensating an MRI system for residual magnetization

Title (de)

Kompensierung eines MRI-Systems für verbleibende Magnetisierung

Title (fr)

Compensation d'un système D'IRM pour magnétisation résiduelle

Publication

EP 1004892 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99309309 A

Priority

US 19822698 A

Abstract (en)

An MRI system includes a gradient compensation system which compensates imaging gradient waveforms for perturbations caused by residual magnetization. A calibration process (200 - 218) for measuring both the stagnant and transient components is performed to produce and store compensating data. The compensating data may be stored in a look-up table (220) or a polynomial may be fit to the compensating data for later use by the MRI system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 33/565

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/055 (2006.01); G01R 33/48 (2006.01); G01R 33/565 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/56518 (2013.01); G01R 33/56563 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004892 A1 20000531; CN 1258001 A 20000628; JP 2000157509 A 20000613; KR 20000047701 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MA, JINGFEI

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZHOU, XIAOHONG

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCKINNON, GREAME COLIN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SOBERING, GEOFFREY S.

2005-12-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050512

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE NL

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MA, JINGFEI

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZHOU, XIAOHONG

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCKINNON, GREAME COLIN

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SOBERING, GEOFFREY S.

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MA, JINGFEI

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZHOU, XIAOHONG

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCKINNON, GREAME COLIN

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SOBERING, GEOFFREY S.

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI