Global Patent Index - EP 1004928 A1

EP 1004928 A1 2000-05-31 - Photographic material for industrial applications

Title (en)

Photographic material for industrial applications

Title (de)

Photographisches Material für industrielle Anwendungen

Title (fr)

Matériau photographique pour des applications industrielles

Publication

EP 1004928 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203952 A

Priority

EP 98203952 A

Abstract (en)

A photographic material comprising a Lippmann emulsion coated on a polycarbonate support is disclosed. The product is suited for new industrial applications under severe conditions of temperature and humidity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/035; B60T 8/32; G03C 1/795

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/08 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/12 (2006.01); G03C 1/795 (2006.01); G03C 1/91 (2006.01); G03C 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/035 (2013.01); G03C 1/795 (2013.01); G03C 1/91 (2013.01); G03C 5/50 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/035 + G03C 2001/03511 + G03C 2001/03594
  2. G03C 1/035 + G03C 2200/38

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004928 A1 20000531; JP 2000155381 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI