Global patent index - EP 1004940 A1

EP 1004940 A1 2000-05-31 - Articles printed by way of electrography

Title (en)

Articles printed by way of electrography

Title (de)

Elektrographisch bedruckte Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Articles imprimés par électrographie

Publication

EP 1004940 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99203733 A

Priority

BE 9800856 A

Abstract (en)

Printing onto an unprimed polyolefin surface by electrophotographic procedure giving adherent toner imager. Articles in which at least one superficial region comprising at least one polyolefin is printed by a toner using an electrophotographic procedure, the surface to be printed being free from any priming (adhesion-improving) layer and the resulting toner image having an adhesion to the article such that it withstands a stripping off force of at least 0.4 N/mm exerted by an adhesive tape.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un article dont au moins une zone superficielle comprend au moins une polyoléfine et a été imprimée au moyen d'un toner par une technique d'électrophotographie, caractérisé en ce que la zone imprimée ne comporte aucun primaire d'impression pour toner, et en ce que l'adhérence du toner à l'article est telle qu'il résiste à une force d'arrachement d'au moins 0,4 N/mm exercée au moyen d'un ruban adhésif. Elle concerne également un procédé pour leur fabrication.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/004 (2013.01); G03G 7/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004940 A1 20000531; BE 1012312 A3 20000905; US 6335131 B1 20020101

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040329

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI