Global Patent Index - EP 1004949 A2

EP 1004949 A2 2000-05-31 - High accuracy timepiece

Title (en)

High accuracy timepiece

Title (de)

Hochgenaues Uhrwerk

Title (fr)

Pièce d'horlogerie à haute précision

Publication

EP 1004949 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308470 A

Priority

JP 31048998 A

Abstract (en)

A data input control section inputs a crown state detection signal from a crown state detection section, and determines how a crown is operated. When the operation of selecting a second rate fast/slow data input mode has been performed, the section controls an indication control section to cause the section to give indication for inputting rate fast/slow data. When the operation of inputting rate fast/slow data has been performed with respect to the crown, the rate fast/slow data specified by the operation is outputted to a data storage section. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 9/00 (2006.01); G04C 9/08 (2006.01); G04G 3/00 (2006.01); G04G 3/02 (2006.01); G04G 21/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 3/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004949 A2 20000531; EP 1004949 A3 20021002; JP 2000137085 A 20000516; JP 3439671 B2 20030825

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1028821

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050125

2003-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030219

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI