Global Patent Index - EP 1004953 A1

EP 1004953 A1 2000-05-31 - Apparatus for operating a current generator

Title (en)

Apparatus for operating a current generator

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zum Betreiben eines Stromgenerators

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'un générateur de courant

Publication

EP 1004953 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122165 A

Priority

EP 98122165 A

Abstract (en)

A circuit arrangement for driving a current generator, in which the current generator (3) is arranged between the poles (+,-) of a power source (1), includes a current mirror circuit (5) for feeding a measurement current (IM) proportional to the generator current (I) into a measurement resistor (RM). Also included is a control device (4) for controlling the voltage drop (US) at the current mirror circuit (U5) to a given desired value (USOLL). The current mirror circuit (5) contains a first transistor (T1) in series with the current generator (3), and a second transistor in series with the measurement resistor (RM).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Schaltungsanordnung liefert ein zwischen den Polen (+,-) einer Energiequelle (1) angeordneter Stromgenerator (3) einen zu messenden Strom (I). Eine Stromspiegelschaltung (5) dient zum Einspeisen eines zum Generatorstrom (I) proportionalen Meßstromes (IM) in einen Meßwiderstand (RM). Eine Regeleinrichtung (4) regelt den Spannungsabfall (U5) an der Stromspiegelschaltung (U5) auf einen Sollwert (USOLL). Damit wird eine ausreichende Versorgungsspannung (U3) für den Stromgenerator (3) sichergestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/262 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004953 A1 20000531; EP 1004953 B1 20070718; DE 59814063 D1 20070830

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101125

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101125

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101125

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080421

2007-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59814063

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-08-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070808

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-07-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020806

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI