Global patent index - EP 1004971 A2

EP 1004971 A2 2000-05-31 - Peripheral apparatus, control method therefor and storage medium

Title (en)

Peripheral apparatus, control method therefor and storage medium

Title (de)

Peripheriegerät mit entsprechendem Steuerverfahren und Speichermedium

Title (fr)

Périphérique, méthode de contrôle correspondante et medium de stockage

Publication

EP 1004971 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309389 A

Priority

  • JP 33396898 A
  • JP 33396998 A
  • JP 33397098 A

Abstract (en)

A job not executable because of an account limit is rejected before it is transmitted so that there is no job which is transmitted but discarded without being executed at a peripheral device because of the account limit. Prior to issuing a job, account information recorded in a peripheral device is acquired to judge whether the job to be issued is in excess of the account limit. If in excess of the account limit, the job is not transmitted and cancelled by displaying an error message to a client. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/12 (2006.01); G06F 13/12 (2006.01); G06Q 99/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 99/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004971 A2 20000531; EP 1004971 A3 20030507

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20100602

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061009

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 3/12 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 13/12 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI