Global Patent Index - EP 1004990 A1

EP 1004990 A1 2000-05-31 - Device for shifting the print position of postal indicia

Title (en)

Device for shifting the print position of postal indicia

Title (de)

Verschiebungsvorrichtung für den Druck von Postwertzeichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de décalage d'empreinte postale

Publication

EP 1004990 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402829 A

Priority

FR 9814756 A

Abstract (en)

A microprocessor controller (26) controls printing as a function of a predetermined shift standard ( delta 0) from article detection. The sensor (28) includes delay device (280,292) for delaying the detection of the front of the postal object as a function of the thickness of the postal object determined from sensing the front of a postal object. The sensing device (28) ensures the detection of the front of a postal object as well as the front of a label.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de décalage d'une empreinte postale dans une machine de traitement de courrier, comprenant des moyens de détection d'un front d'un article de courrier, des moyens (200) d'impression d'une empreinte postale sur cet article de courrier et des moyens de commande et de contrôle reliés d'une part aux moyens de détection et d'autre part aux moyens d'impression pour commander l'impression de l'empreinte postale sur l'article de courrier en fonction d'un décalage standard 0 prédéterminé à partir de la détection du front de l'article de courrier, les moyens de détection d'un front de l'article de courrier comportant des moyens (280 ; 292) pour retarder la détection du front de l'article de courrier en fonction de l'épaisseur de l'article de courrier déterminée à partir des moyens de détection d'un front d'un article de courrier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00564 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00669 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00685 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004990 A1 20000531; EP 1004990 B1 20040526; DE 69917566 D1 20040701; DE 69917566 T2 20050825; FR 2786295 A1 20000526; FR 2786295 B1 20010216; US 6234693 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131116

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69917566

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131116

2014-06-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69917566

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917566 P 20040701

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030611

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI