Global Patent Index - EP 1005003 A3

EP 1005003 A3 2001-04-11 - Security equipment, particularly for the protection of locations

Title (en)

Security equipment, particularly for the protection of locations

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung, insbesondere zum Schutz von Bereichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité, notamment pour la protection de zones

Publication

EP 1005003 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99203806 A

Priority

IT MI982545 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1005003A2] Security equipment (1), particularly for the protection of paved (4) locations (2), capable of warning of approaches, intrusions and the like, with great sensitivity and reliability, comprises a plurality of piezoelectric transducers (12) intended to be embedded in the pavement (4) of the location (2) to be protected, each transducer (12) comprising a flat body (14) and a flexible region (33) of predetermined area in a closed ring about the flat body (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 11/00 (2006.01); G08B 13/10 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

E01C (2006.01); G08B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005003 A2 20000531; EP 1005003 A3 20010411; EP 1005003 B1 20030813; DE 69910332 D1 20030918; DE 69910332 T2 20040701; ES 2204062 T3 20040416; IL 133044 A 20030731; IL 133044 D0 20010319; IT 1303861 B1 20010301; IT MI982545 A1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141116

2015-12-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151229

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141115

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20150717

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141115

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69910332

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140131

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204062 T3

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910332 P 20030918

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010712

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI