Global Patent Index - EP 1005016 A2

EP 1005016 A2 2000-05-31 - Method and circuit arrangement for measuring speech level in a speech processing system

Title (en)

Method and circuit arrangement for measuring speech level in a speech processing system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zur Sprachpegelmessung in einem Sprachsignalverarbeitungssystem

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de circuit pour mesurer le niveau de parole dans un système de traitement du signal de parole

Publication

EP 1005016 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99440312 A

Priority

DE 19854341 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves feeding a speech signal to a speech pause detector and a speech detector; if the pause detector detects a pause and the speech detector detects speech, a mean value of the speech signal is measured with a mean value detector whose transmission function is matched to that of the human ear; if speech is detected the mean value is placed in a memory for further processing as the measured speech level. An Independent claim is also included for a circuit for speech level measurement in a speech signal processing system.

Abstract (de)

Die Sprachpegelmessung hat besondere Bedeutung für eine erfolgreiche Echokompensation in Telekommunikationssystemen, für eine Geräuschunterdrückung in lärmerfüllter Umgebung, beispielsweise in Militärfahrzeugen, oder bei der Spracherkennung und in Sprachkodierungs- und -dekodierungseinrichtungen. Erfindungsgemäß wird ein Verfahren angegeben, das die Sprachpegelmessung nur dann zuläßt, wenn Merkmale von Sprache erkannt und Störer sowie Sprachpausen für die Messung ausgeblendet werden. Dazu werden Sprach- und Pausendetektoren sowie ein Mittelwertbildner eingesetzt, dessen Zeitverhalten weitgehend an die Wahrnehmungsfähigkeit des menschlichen Ohres angepaßt ist. Kurz gesprochene Vokale werden somit gut erfaßt, nasale Laute oder Konsonanten werden bei fallenden Pegeln weitgehend unterdrückt. Es wird eine Sprachpegelmeßeinrichtung angegeben, die in kurzer Adaptionszeit sehr genaue Ergebnisse liefert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/48 (2013.01); G10L 25/78 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/48 (2013.01); G10L 2025/783 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005016 A2 20000531; EP 1005016 A3 20001129; DE 19854341 A1 20000608; US 6539350 B1 20030325

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031218

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 11/00 A, 7G 01H 3/12 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI