Global Patent Index - EP 1005057 A2

EP 1005057 A2 2000-05-31 - Arc extinguishing device

Title (en)

Arc extinguishing device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Löschung eines Lichtbogens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour éteindre un arc

Publication

EP 1005057 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123090 A

Priority

DE 19854108 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has light arc guide rails (9-1) connected to the contacts (2-4) to carry the light arc away from the contacts to quenching coils (15-17) at the ends remote from the contacts with movable ferromagnetic metal cores (19-21). A short circuit bridge (25) connected to the other side of the coils from the contacts short circuits the cores when these are displaced by the magnetic fields induced by the coils when the light arc reaches them.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zur Löschung eines sich zwischen Kontakten (2-4) einer Schaltanlage, eines Transformators oder Sammelschienen u.dgl. ausbildenden Lichtbogens (26). Damit ein zwischen den Kontakten (2-4) der Schaltanlage, des Transformators u. dgl. sich ausbildender Lichtbogen (26) auf einfache Weise schnell und sicher gelöscht wird, schlägt die Erfindung vor, an den Kontakten (2-4) Lichtbogenlaufschienen (9-11) anzuordnen, an deren den Kontakten abgewandten Enden sich Löschspulen (15-17) befinden. Diese werden nach Erreichen des Lichtbogens (26) von Strom durchflossen und erzeugen jeweils ein Magneffeld, welches dann in der entsprechenden Spule (15-17) einen verschiebbar angeordneten magnetisierbaren Metallkern (19-21) so lange verschiebt, bis dieser die Kurzschlußbrücke (25) kontaktiert und damit den Lichtbogen (26) elektrisch kurzschließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/20; H01H 33/18; H01H 79/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/20 (2006.01); H01H 79/00 (2006.01); H01H 33/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/20 (2013.01); H01H 79/00 (2013.01); H01H 33/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005057 A2 20000531; EP 1005057 A3 20010404; DE 19854108 C1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI