Global Patent Index - EP 1005058 A2

EP 1005058 A2 2000-05-31 - Vacuum switchgear

Title (en)

Vacuum switchgear

Title (de)

Vakuumschaltgerät

Title (fr)

Appareillage commutateur à vide

Publication

EP 1005058 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123233 A

Priority

JP 33710798 A

Abstract (en)

The vacuum switchgear comprises a vacuum interrupter from which the seal is put on to both ends of insulation container where the insulation medium is enclosed airtight with the first and second metallic material, in which the vacuum interrupter has fixed electrode which penetrates through the first metallic material and clings the first metallic material, and movable electrode which penetrates the through the second metallic material, is fixed the second metallic material through bellows, and is provided to oppose to the fixed electrode; and operation mechanism which moves the movable electrode along a straight line at three positions of a close position, an open position, and an isolation position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66 (2006.01); H01H 33/38 (2006.01); H01H 33/666 (2006.01); H01H 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/666 (2013.01); H01H 31/003 (2013.01); H01H 33/66261 (2013.01); H01H 33/6662 (2013.01); H01H 2033/566 (2013.01); H01H 2033/66269 (2013.01); H01H 2033/66276 (2013.01); H01H 2033/66284 (2013.01); H01H 2033/66292 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005058 A2 20000531; EP 1005058 A3 20010711; EP 1005058 B1 20060531; CN 1214422 C 20050810; CN 1256503 A 20000614; DE 69931583 D1 20060706; DE 69931583 T2 20070426; JP 2000164084 A 20000616; JP 3664899 B2 20050629

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151008

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931583 P 20060706

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2005-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHIOIRI, TETSU,TOSHIBA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2005-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAMAZAKI, TOSHIHARU,TOSHIBA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2005-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MURAKAMI, SHIN,TOSHIBA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2005-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOKOKURA, KUNIO,TOSHIBA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2005-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SATO, JUNICHI,TOSHIBA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991201

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI