Global patent index - EP 1005060 A2

EP 1005060 A2 2000-05-31 - Undervoltage release device

Title (en)

Undervoltage release device

Title (de)

Unterspannungsauslöser

Title (fr)

Déclencheur à manque de tension

Publication

EP 1005060 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122990 A

Priority

DE 19853901 A

Abstract (en)

The trigger has a control lever (16) coupled to a manually operated switching crank (3), loaded by a spring (17) and pivotable from an initial position to a release position. In the initial position the control lever is pressed against a blocking pawl (7) by the spring when a trigger lever (8) is in a latched position. The control lever holds the pawl and trigger lever in this position and there is no support for the pawl and trigger lever in the release position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Unterspannungsauslöser für elektrische Niederspannungs-Schutzschalter mit einem von einem Elektromagneten (4) betätigbaren stößelförmigen Magnetanker (5), welcher über eine Sperrklinke (7) und einen Auslösehebel (8) auf einen Auslöseschieber (9) wirken, derart, dass bei Nichterreichen der Steuerspannung der Auslöseschieber (9) ein Auslösen des Schutzschalters bewirkt. Um zu erreichen, dass der Unterspannungsauslöser (1) auch dann in seine Einschaltstellung gebracht werden kann, wenn keine Steuerspannung an dem Elektromagnet (4) anliegt, schlägt die Erfindung vor, dass der Unterspannungsauslöser (1) einen durch eine Feder (17) beaufschlagten schwenkbaren Steuerhebel (16) umfasst, der als Auslösesperre ausgebildet ist und der in der eingeschalteten Stellung des Unterspannungsauslöser (1) sich an der Sperrklinke (7) abstützt, derart, dass Sperrklinke (7) und Auslösehebel (8) in ihrer Verklinkungsstellung fixiert werden. Wird hingegen der Steuerhebel (16) verschwenkt, wird die Auslösesperre aufgehoben und Sperrklinke (7) sowie Auslösehebel (8) bleiben nur dann miteinander verklinkt, wenn an dem Elektromagnet (4) eine ausreichend große Steuerspannung anliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/12; H01H 71/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/52 (2006.01); H01H 83/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/12 (2013.01); H01H 71/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005060 A2 20000531; EP 1005060 A3 20010711; EP 1005060 B1 20060621; DE 19853901 C1 20000615

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060923

2006-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2002-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH FR GB IT LI

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020105

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI