Global Patent Index - EP 1005101 A3

EP 1005101 A3 2002-09-25 - Window pane antenna with high frequency high impedance connected heating field

Title (en)

Window pane antenna with high frequency high impedance connected heating field

Title (de)

Fensterscheibenantenne mit hochfrequent hochohmig angeschlossenem Heizfeld

Title (fr)

Antenne de vitre connectée au réseau chauffant par un champs à haute fréquence et à impédance élevée

Publication

EP 1005101 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122902 A

Priority

DE 19854169 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1005101A2] The windscreen antenna has a feed network (19,20) adjacent the side edges of the windscreen (23) using an inductive coupling for supplying the heating current to a heating field (2) with collector rails (3,4) at either side, simultaneously acting as the antenna, or positioned adjacent a separate conductor (1) acting as the antenna. Each feed network has a magnetic core (9,10) with a primary winding (5,6) supplied with the heating current and a field compensation winding (13,14) supplied with current via a field compensation current source (15,16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01Q 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1278 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854169 A1 20000525; EP 1005101 A2 20000531; EP 1005101 A3 20020925; US 6184837 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01Q 1/12 A, 7H 01Q 1/32 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI