Global Patent Index - EP 1005107 A2

EP 1005107 A2 2000-05-31 - Screwless connecting terminal for electric leads

Title (en)

Screwless connecting terminal for electric leads

Title (de)

Schraubenlose Anschlussklemme für elektrische Leiter

Title (fr)

Borne de connexion sans vis pour des conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 1005107 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123332 A

Priority

DE 19855050 A

Abstract (en)

The connector has an insulating housing, at least two cable holders with first and second holding elements. The second element (12) is spring-loaded towards the first to clamp a cable end between them. An actuating element opens the holder formed by the holding elements, and a third, spring-loaded holding element (18) forms a second cable holder with the first and/or second holding element that is not opened when opening the main holder.

Abstract (de)

Eine Steckklemme zum Verbinden der Enden mehrerer elektrische Kabel, die als Litze ausgebildet sind, enthält eine Aufnahme mit zwei Halterungen. Die eine Halterung muss durch ein Betätigungselement geöffnet werden, um das Kabel einschieben zu können. Während dieses Einschiebens bei geöffneter erster Halterung wird eine zweite Halterung allein durch das Einschieben des Kabels geöffnet. Diese zweite Halterung benötigt zu ihrem Öffnen nur sehr wenig Kraft. Sie hält das Kabel vorübergehend, während die erste Halterung noch geöffnet ist, damit der Monteur auch noch die anderen Kabel in die Steckklemme einführen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4818 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005107 A2 20000531; EP 1005107 A3 20010307; DE 19855050 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI