Global Patent Index - EP 1005107 A3

EP 1005107 A3 2001-03-07 - Screwless connecting terminal for electric leads

Title (en)

Screwless connecting terminal for electric leads

Title (de)

Schraubenlose Anschlussklemme für elektrische Leiter

Title (fr)

Borne de connexion sans vis pour des conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 1005107 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123332 A

Priority

DE 19855050 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1005107A2] The connector has an insulating housing, at least two cable holders with first and second holding elements. The second element (12) is spring-loaded towards the first to clamp a cable end between them. An actuating element opens the holder formed by the holding elements, and a third, spring-loaded holding element (18) forms a second cable holder with the first and/or second holding element that is not opened when opening the main holder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4818 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005107 A2 20000531; EP 1005107 A3 20010307; DE 19855050 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI