Global Patent Index - EP 1005108 A2

EP 1005108 A2 2000-05-31 - Universal ground clip assembly

Title (en)

Universal ground clip assembly

Title (de)

Universelle Erdungsklemmezusammenbau

Title (fr)

Assemblage d'un clip de mise à la terre universel

Publication

EP 1005108 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309452 A

Priority

US 11004398 P

Abstract (en)

A universal ground clip assembly (10) for electrically connecting interchangeable messenger clamps (131, 13b, 13c, 13d) to a cable messenger strand (11) strung between utility poles. A saddle shaped grounding clip (17) having a generally U-shaped cross-section with opposing first and second side members (19,21) is positioned over the insulation jacket (14) of the messenger strand and includes at least one pointed prong (22) for penetrating the messenger strand insulation jacket (14) and engaging the messenger strand conductor (11). Compression of the grounding clip causes the prong (22) to penetrate the insulation jacket (14) thereby establishing an electrical connection with the messenger strand conductor (11). The clip assembly (10) may further include a variety of interchangeable messenger clamps (13a, 13b, 13c, 13d), such as a ground or span clamp, capable of engaging the grounding clip (17). Upon engagement, the interchangeable messenger clamps (131, 13b, 13c, 13d) establish an electrical connection with the grounding clip (17). During assembly and installation, the grounding clip (17) is preferably positioned and compressed on the messenger strand (11) prior to installation of the interchangeable messenger clamps. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/64; H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 4/00 (2006.01); H01R 4/64 (2006.01); H02G 7/00 (2006.01); H05F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/646 (2013.01); H01R 4/2408 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005108 A2 20000531; EP 1005108 A3 20020424; CA 2290938 A1 20000526; JP 2000166069 A 20000616; MX PA99011022 A 20050110

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2003-02-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 4/64 A, 7H 01R 4/24 B, 7H 02G 7/05 B

2001-11-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMAS & BETTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI