Global Patent Index - EP 1005113 A2

EP 1005113 A2 2000-05-31 - Electric connector

Title (en)

Electric connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1005113 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123512 A

Priority

IT TO981004 A

Abstract (en)

An electric connector (2) having an insulating casing (4) defining a number of cavities (5) for housing respective electric terminals (6) and having axes parallel to a first direction (A) wherein the connector (2) is connected to a complementary connector (3); a retaining element (35) for retaining the terminals (6) inside the cavities (5) and connectable in sliding manner to the casing (4) and into a closed position in a second direction (B) crosswise to the first direction (A); and a tab (51) which projects from the casing (4), is normally set to a disabling position disabling connection of the connector (2) and the complementary connector (3) and interfering with a connecting region (14) of the connectors (2, 3), and which can be set, by interacting with the retaining element (35) and when the retaining element (35) is in the closed position, to an enabling position enabling connection of the connector (2) and the complementary connector (3) and wherein the tab (51) does not interfere with the connecting region (14). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4362 (2013.01); H01R 13/62977 (2013.01); H01R 13/62911 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005113 A2 20000531; EP 1005113 A3 20000726; EP 1005113 B1 20030723; AT 245858 T 20030815; DE 69909717 D1 20030828; DE 69909717 T2 20040415; IT 1303187 B1 20001030; IT TO981004 A1 20000528; IT TO981004 D0 19981127

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI AUTOMOTIVE HOLDING, GUYANCOURT, FR

- Document: DE 69909717

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2014-08-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Effective date: 20140715

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111125

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, GUYANCOURT, FR

- Document: DE 69909717

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111125

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69909717

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69909717

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2011-09-09 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2011-07-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-05-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-08-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-11-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-11-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-11-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031103

2003-10-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-10-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-10-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909717 P 20030828

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/629 A, 7H 01R 13/436 B, 7H 01R 13/64 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI