Global patent index - EP 1005338 A1

EP 1005338 A1 2000-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED AURONE DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED AURONE DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE AURONE -DERIVATE

Title (fr)

DERIVES D'AURONE SUBSTITUES

Publication

EP 1005338 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937084 A

Priority

  • US 9815388 W
  • US 5374297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904789A1] A method for treating a microbial infection is disclosed. The method includes administering to a patient a pharmaceutical composition containing a compound of formula (IA) where each R is independently H, OH, Br, Cl, I, amino, thiol, nitro, C1-4 alkoxy, C1-4 alkenyloxy, C2-6 alkoxyalkyleneoxy, C1-4 alkylthio, C3-18 alkyl, or C3-18 alkenyl; or two adjacent R's, taken together, are a C2-18 bivalent moiety containing at least one oxygen atom, substituted or disubstituted with A or B or both, A being H, OH, Br, Cl, I, amino, or thiol, and B being H, C1-10 alkyl, C2-18 alkenyl, or C6-18 aryl; provided at least two Rs are not H; further provided that when each of two Rs is one of OH, C1-4 alkoxy, C1-4 alkenyloxy, or C2-6 alkoxyalkyleneoxy, and X is phenyl substituted with two substituents independently selected from OH, alkoxy, and alkenyloxy, the remaining R cannot be prenyl; further provided that when each of two Rs is one of OH, C1-4 alkoxy, C1-4 alkenyloxy, or C2-6 alkoxyalkyleneoxy, and X is phenyl substituted with three substituents independently selected from OH, alkoxy, and alkenyloxy, the remaining R cannot be prenyl; further provided that when each of two Rs is one of OH, C1-4 alkoxy, C1-4 alkenyloxy, or C2-6 alkoxyalkyleneoxy, and X is phenyl subsituted with a prenyl substituent and with two additional substituents independently selected from OH, alkoxy, and alkenyloxy, the remaining R cannot be H or OH; further provided that when each of two Rs is one of OH, C1-4 alkoxy, C1-4 alkenyloxy, or C2-6 alkoxyalkyleneoxy, and X is phenyl subsituted with a substituent containing three rings and with two additional substituents independently selected from OH, alkoxy, and alkenyloxy, the remaining R cannot be prenyl; X is C4-10 alkyl, C4-20 alkenyl, or a C4-20 single, C6-20 bridged, or C6-20 fused ring moiety containing cycloalkyl, cycloalkenyl, aryl, heterocycle, or heteroaryl, where X is substituted with H, OH, Cl, Br, I, amino, cyano, nitro, alkyl, alkoxy, alkenyl, or alkenyloxy; provided that if X is a heteroaryl or heterocyclic moiety where two Rs are each OH and meta to each other, then the remaining R is H and ortho to each of the two hydroxyls, and Y and Z are each O, and a ring atom of X is linked directly to the sp<2> carbon atom adjacent to X, then substituted with H, OH, Cl, Br, I, amino, cyano, alkyl, alkoxy, alkenyl, or alkenyloxy; and each of Y and Z is independently selected from O, S, and NH; or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt or ester thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/34; C07D 307/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/343 (2006.01); A61K 31/35 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07D 307/82 (2006.01); C07D 307/83 (2006.01); C07D 407/06 (2006.01); C07D 493/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 307/82 (2013.01); C07D 307/83 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904789 A1 19990204; AU 751213 B2 20020808; AU 8587698 A 19990216; BR 9811554 A 20000912; CA 2297753 A1 19990204; EP 1005338 A1 20000607; EP 1005338 A4 20011107; JP 2001510801 A 20010807

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030201

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHU, WAI-LAM, ALEX

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JENSEN, FLEMMING, R.

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JENSEN, THOMAS, B.

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SOEKILDE, BIRGITTE

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SANTANA-SOERENSON, ALEXANDRA

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCALPINE, JAMES, B.

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STAFFORD, ANGELA M.

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NOBLE, CATHERINE

2001-11-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07D 307/78 A, 7C 07D 307/83 B, 7C 07D 307/82 B, 7A 61K 31/34 B

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHU, WAI-LAM, ALEX

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JENSEN, FLEMMING, R.

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JENSEN, THOMAS, B.

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SOEKILDE, BIRGITTE

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SANTANA-SOERENSON, ALEXANDRA

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCALPINE, JAMES, B.

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE