Global Patent Index - EP 1005339 A1

EP 1005339 A1 2000-06-07 - CAROTENOID FORMULATION

Title (en)

CAROTENOID FORMULATION

Title (de)

ZUBEREITUNG ENTHALTEND CAROTINOIDE

Title (fr)

FORMULATION A BASE DE CAROTENOIDE

Publication

EP 1005339 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924820 A

Priority

  • AU PO693397 A
  • US 9810356 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852561A1] The present invention provides composition of lycopene dispersed in a medium chain triglyceride oil derived from the esterification of fatty acids and glycerol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/01; A23L 1/27; A61K 9/10; C09B 61/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/10 (2006.01); A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 31/01 (2006.01); A61K 31/015 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/14 (2006.01); A61K 47/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/14 (2013.01); A61K 9/107 (2013.01); A61K 31/01 (2013.01); A61K 31/015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852561 A1 19981126; AU PO693397 D0 19970612; CN 1272059 A 20001101; EP 1005339 A1 20000607; EP 1005339 A4 20040609; IL 132989 D0 20010319; JP 2001527573 A 20011225; ZA 9804230 B 19990420

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060318

2005-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050524

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

2004-06-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/01 A

2004-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/10 B

2004-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 09B 61/00 B

2004-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 23L 1/27 B

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS CORPORATION

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991204

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE