Global patent index - EP 1005340 A1

EP 1005340 A1 2000-06-07 - RETINOID ANTAGONISTS FOR PREVENTION OF SURGICAL ADHESIONS

Title (en)

RETINOID ANTAGONISTS FOR PREVENTION OF SURGICAL ADHESIONS

Title (de)

RETINOID ANTAGONISTE ZUR VORBEUGUNG VON OPERATIVEN ADHÄSIONSBILDUNG

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES RETINOIDES POUR LA PREVENTION D'ADHERENCES NECESSITANT UNE INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE

Publication

EP 1005340 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918060 A

Priority

  • US 9807060 W
  • US 4352897 P
  • US 5075197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846223A1] Certain retinoid antagonists have been found to be useful in the prevention or minimization of surgical adhesion formation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/38; A61K 31/27; A61K 31/35; A61K 31/385; A61P 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 333/24 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 31/235 (2006.01); A61K 31/34 (2006.01); A61K 31/38 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/382 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4402 (2006.01); A61K 31/4406 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 277/24 (2006.01); C07D 335/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846223 A1 19981022; AU 7105398 A 19981111; AU 723146 B2 20000817; CA 2286261 A1 19981022; EP 1005340 A1 20000607; EP 1005340 A4 20010207; JP 2001524082 A 20011127

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/38 A

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/385 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/35 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/27 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 43/00 B

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030507

2001-02-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE