Global Patent Index - EP 1005355 A1

EP 1005355 A1 2000-06-07 - METHOD OF TREATING GASTROINTESTINAL ULCERS AND COMPOSITIONS THEREFOR

Title (en)

METHOD OF TREATING GASTROINTESTINAL ULCERS AND COMPOSITIONS THEREFOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MAGENDARMGESCHWÜREN UND DIE DAZUGEHÖRIGEN MITTEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT DES ULCERES GASTRO-INTESTINAUX

Publication

EP 1005355 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919780 A

Priority

  • US 9807686 W
  • US 4302397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846249A1] The invention provides methods and compositions for providing chronic gastrointestinal ulcer healing or acute gastroprotection. In particular, administration of a pharmaceutically effective amount of VEGF, such as from about 30 ng/kg to about 1000 mu g/kg per day for about a week to two months results in healing of GI ulcers in a mammal, such as a human. Examples of gastrointestinal ulcers include duodenal ulcers, peptic ulcers, drug-induced ulcers, or intestinal ulcers, including but not limited to damage due to non-steroidal (NSAID) and anti-inflammatory drugs, gastro-esphogheal reflux disease or inflammatory bowel disease such as ulcerative colitis and Crohn's disease. Similarly, administration of a pharmaceutically effective amount of VEGF, such as from about 3 mu g/kg to about 1000 mu g/kg VEGF, from 0 minutes to about 60 minutes prior to potential injury to the GI tract, such as ingestion of an NSAID or ethanol, results in acute gastroprotection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/1866 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846249 A1 19981022; EP 1005355 A1 20000607; EP 1005355 A4 20020717

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030314

2002-07-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 38/00 A, 7A 61K 38/19 B, 7A 61P 1/04 B

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991112

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE