Global Patent Index - EP 1005360 A1

EP 1005360 A1 2000-06-07 - ANTIOXIDANT PROTEIN 2, GENE AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR

Title (en)

ANTIOXIDANT PROTEIN 2, GENE AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR

Title (de)

ANTIOXIDANZ PROTEIN 2,GEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PROTEINE ANTI-OXYDANTE 2, GENE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 1005360 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919730 A

Priority

  • US 9806666 W
  • US 4089797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843666A1] The present invention involves the identification of a novel gene and protein, now designated as antioxidant protein 2 (Aop2 and AOP2, respectively). Studies indicate that the Ltw4 and Aop2 are a single gene. In addition, Aop2 also appears to be the gene responsible for the Athl trait in mice - a predisposition to atherosclerotic disease. The human homolog for this gene also has been identified. This discovery makes possible a variety of uses for AOP2 and the corresponding gene, for example, development of reagents (antibodies, expression vectors, cell lines, congenic and transgenic mice) that may be used in the diagnosis and treatment of atherosclerosis and related disease states.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/43; A61K 39/395; A61K 48/00; C12N 9/00; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/63; C12P 19/34; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843666 A1 19981008; CA 2285631 A1 19981008; EP 1005360 A1 20000607; EP 1005360 A4 20010207; JP 2001522229 A 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE JACKSON LABORATORY

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC.

2001-02-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/43 A, 7A 61K 39/395 B, 7A 61K 48/00 B, 7C 12N 15/11 B, 7C 12N 9/00 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B, 7C 12P 19/34 B, 7G 01N 33/53 B, 7C 12N 9/20 B

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991101

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE