Global patent index - EP 1005384 A1

EP 1005384 A1 2000-06-07 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR INTRAPARENCHYMAL POSITIONING OF MEDICAL DEVICES

Title (en)

METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR INTRAPARENCHYMAL POSITIONING OF MEDICAL DEVICES

Title (de)

METHODE UND APPARAT ZUR INTRAPARENCHYMELEN POSITIONIERUNG MEDIZINISCHER GERÄTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE MISE EN PLACE INTRAPARENCHYMATEUSE DE DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX

Publication

EP 1005384 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98906564 A

Priority

  • US 9803204 W
  • US 92044697 A
  • US 96916597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911318A1] A catheter and magnet combination (20) adapted for intra-parenchymal positioning of the catheter (22) in the body with a magnetic field. The catheter (22) has proximal and distal ends ((26, 28), respectively) and a lumen (30) therebetween. A magnet (24) is disposed in the distal end of the lumen (30) so that the distal end of the catheter (22) can be positioned within the body with the aid of an externally applied magnetic field. A tether (32) is attached to the magnet (24) and extends through the lumen (30) and out the proximal end (26) so that the magnet (24) can be removed from the catheter (22) through the lumen (30) once the distal end of the catheter (22) is properly positioned. In one embodiment of the invention, the tether (32) is sufficiently stiff to be able to push the catheter (22) through the tissue. With this embodiment, the magnetic field orients the magnet (24), and thus the tip (36) of the catheter (22), and some or all of the force for moving the catheter (22) is applied via the tether (32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/0127 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911318 A1 19990311; AU 6175498 A 19990322; EP 1005384 A1 20000607; EP 1005384 A4 20010620; JP 2001514055 A 20010911

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WERP, PETER, R.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RITTER, ROGERS, C.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BLUME, WALTER, M.

2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040810

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030211

2001-06-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WERP, PETER, R.

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RITTER, ROGERS, C.

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BLUME, WALTER, M.

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL