Global Patent Index - EP 1005387 A1

EP 1005387 A1 2000-06-07 - BINDING FOR CROSS-COUNTRY OR TRAIL SKIS

Title (en)

BINDING FOR CROSS-COUNTRY OR TRAIL SKIS

Title (de)

LANGLAUF- ODER TOURENSKIBINDUNG

Title (fr)

FIXATION POUR SKIS DE FOND OU SKIS DE RANDONNEE

Publication

EP 1005387 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98960056 A

Priority

  • DE 19809729 A
  • IB 9802124 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19809729A1] The invention relates to a binding (17) for cross-country or trail skis, comprising a device (10) for pivoting an assigned shoe (11) about an axis (13) which in the front area of the shoe extends approximately parallel to the sole surface (12) and approximately cross-wise to the longitudinal direction of the sole or ski, as well as a device (14) for the elastic resetting of the shoe (11) from a tilted position to a position approximately parallel to the ski. The invention is characterized in that it provides for an additional elastically deformable element (15) which counteracts the device (14) for elastically resetting the shoe (11), especially during initial tilting of the shoe (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944700A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19809729 A1 19990909; EP 1005387 A1 20000607; EP 1005387 B1 20020925; NO 20004160 A 20000818; NO 20004160 D0 20000818; NO 313936 B1 20021230; US 6402184 B1 20020611; WO 9944700 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805728

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-31

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR