Global Patent Index - EP 1005399 A1

EP 1005399 A1 2000-06-07 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOVING DISCARDS AND SCALES FROM A PRESS PLATE OR DIE IN METAL EXTRUDING PRESSES COVERED WITH SCALES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOVING DISCARDS AND SCALES FROM A PRESS PLATE OR DIE IN METAL EXTRUDING PRESSES COVERED WITH SCALES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON PRESSREST UND SCHALE VON EINER PRESSSCHEIBE BZW. MATRIZE BEIM METALLSTRANGPRESSEN MIT SCHALE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ELIMINER LE CULOT ET LA PEAU D'UN PLATEAU DE PRESSE OU D'UNE MATRICE LORS DE L'EXTRUSION DE METAUX AVEC PRODUCTION DE PEAU

Publication

EP 1005399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948680 A

Priority

  • DE 9802129 W
  • DE 19736505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736505A1] Removal of the shell from a press disk or die (4) takes place by radial expansion of the shell on a rotating press disk or die using one or more radially adjustable rolls (12) followed by axial stripping of the shell. The apparatus comprises a press residue separating unit (1) and a shell removal unit (2). The latter incorporates a rotatable tray (21) for the press disk or die with a shell, a rolling unit with roll(s) (12) for expanding the shell, and equipment for separate bringing out of the press disk or die and the shell.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 35/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910114A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736505 A1 19990225; AT 213181 T 20020215; EP 1005399 A1 20000607; EP 1005399 B1 20020213; ES 2172922 T3 20021001; JP 2001513447 A 20010904; JP 3311739 B2 20020805; US 6305207 B1 20011023; WO 9910114 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS EUMUCO G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-07-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS EUMUCO G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030729

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030728

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-07-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-07-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-07-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030724

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172922 T3

2002-07-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020627

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020619

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803080 20020321

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI

2002-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213181 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010706

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000214

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI