Global Patent Index - EP 1005404 A1

EP 1005404 A1 2000-06-07 - ELECTRIC RAZOR

Title (en)

ELECTRIC RAZOR

Title (de)

TROCKENRASIERAPPARAT

Title (fr)

RASOIR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1005404 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924216 A

Priority

  • DE 19736776 A
  • EP 9802470 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736776A1] Disclosed is an electric shaver with a casing (1) including an electric motor (2) provided with a mechanism (3) for motion transfer to at least one cutting member moving back an forth (4), and at least one horizontally oscillating cutting head (6) formed by a frame (7, 55) comprised of two interactive cutting members (4, 5). The electric motor (2) is nested in the casing (1) in such a way that the internal forces that are inevitably generated when the shaver is in operation cause the motor to sway. The oscillatory movement of the electric motor (2) is transferred to the cutting head (6), so that the latter also oscillates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/28 (2006.01); B26B 19/04 (2006.01); B26B 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/28 (2013.01); B26B 19/048 (2013.01); B26B 19/288 (2013.01); B26B 19/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910140A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736776 A1 19990304; DE 19736776 C2 19990602; AT 213688 T 20020315; AT 214650 T 20020415; AU 7649498 A 19990316; AU 7909598 A 19990316; AU 9338698 A 19990316; CN 1091676 C 20021002; CN 1098145 C 20030108; CN 1138618 C 20040218; CN 1267248 A 20000920; CN 1268082 A 20000927; CN 1268083 A 20000927; DE 59803213 D1 20020404; DE 59803445 D1 20020425; EP 1003630 A1 20000531; EP 1003630 B1 20020320; EP 1005404 A1 20000607; EP 1005404 B1 20020227; EP 1005405 A1 20000607; ES 2175779 T3 20021116; HK 1027996 A1 20040702; HK 1027997 A1 20030228; JP 2001513414 A 20010904; JP 2001513415 A 20010904; JP 2001513416 A 20010904; JP 4328012 B2 20090909; JP 4328013 B2 20090909; JP 4328014 B2 20090909; PT 1003630 E 20020830; RU 2000107113 A 20040320; RU 2000107115 A 20040320; RU 2170660 C1 20010720; RU 2175602 C1 20011110; US 6226871 B1 20010508; US 6357117 B1 20020319; US 6357118 B1 20020319; WO 9910140 A1 19990304; WO 9910141 A1 19990304; WO 9910142 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120425

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120425

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100425

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100425

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRAUN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-02 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-05-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-05-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803213 20020404

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000212

2002-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213688 T 20020315

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ULLMANN, ROLAND

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOTTENROTT, SEBASTIAN

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ODEMER, MICHAEL

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARMS, MICHAEL

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EICHHORN, REINHOLD

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOLF, JUERGEN

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUNK, PETER

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOERKEL, JENS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010510

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ULLMANN, ROLAND

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOTTENROTT, SEBASTIAN

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ODEMER, MICHAEL

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARMS, MICHAEL

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EICHHORN, REINHOLD

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOLF, JUERGEN

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUNK, PETER

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOERKEL, JENS

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000212

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000212