Global patent index - EP 1005439 A1

EP 1005439 A1 2000-06-07 - ROOF AND WALL CLADDING

Title (en)

ROOF AND WALL CLADDING

Title (de)

DACH- UND WANDVERKLEIDUNG

Title (fr)

REVETEMENTS POUR TOITURE ET MUR

Publication

EP 1005439 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939560 A

Priority

  • EP 9803978 W
  • GB 9717482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908971A1] Pipe sections for external roof or wall cladding are formed of bonded man-made vitreous fibre batts wherein the fibres have a viscosity at 1400 DEG C of 10 to 170 poise and a dissolution rate at pH 4.5 of at least 20 nm per day.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03C 13/06; C03C 13/00; E04B 1/80; E04C 2/16; E04D 3/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/80 (2006.01); C03C 13/00 (2006.01); C03C 13/06 (2006.01); D01F 9/08 (2006.01); E04B 1/78 (2006.01); E04C 2/16 (2006.01); E04D 3/35 (2006.01); F16L 59/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 59/021 (2013.01); C03C 13/00 (2013.01); C03C 13/06 (2013.01); E04B 1/78 (2013.01); E04C 2/16 (2013.01); E04D 3/351 (2013.01); C03C 2213/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908971A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908971 A1 19990225; AU 8802698 A 19990308; CA 2301231 A1 19990225; CN 1267272 A 20000920; EP 1005439 A1 20000607; GB 9717482 D0 19971022; HR P980453 A2 19990630; HU 0003072 A2 20010628; JP 2001515007 A 20010918; PL 338832 A1 20001120; SK 1872000 A3 20000912

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021204

2001-08-01 [111L] LICENCES

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111L

- Free Format Text: 20010602 0100 ROCKWOOL ROCKPANEL B.V. * 20010602 0200 ROCKDELTA A/S * 20010602 0300 LAPINUS FIBRES B.V. * 20010602 0400 ROCKWOOL/GRODAN B.V.

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-07-05 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000208;LV PAYMENT 20000208;RO PAYMENT 20000208;SI PAYMENT 20000208

2000-07-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: LV PAYMENT 20000208;RO PAYMENT 20000208;SI PAYMENT 20000208

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000208;LV PAYMENT 20000208;SI PAYMENT 20000208