Global Patent Index - EP 1005441 A2

EP 1005441 A2 2000-06-07 - SURFACE COVERING MATERIAL

Title (en)

SURFACE COVERING MATERIAL

Title (de)

MATERIAL ZUR DECKUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

MATIERE DE RECOUVREMENT DE SURFACE

Publication

EP 1005441 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98936374 A

Priority

  • EP 9803737 W
  • ZA 9705460 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858886A2] A surface covering material is described which can be applied on to for example rock and coal surfaces (for convenience both rock and coal will further in this specification be referred to as "rock") in tunnels, stopes and pillars as well as around base plates of rock bolts to inhibit the breaking away of the rock covered thereby. The material comprises a mixture of a cementitious constituent, comprising a highly water absorbent cement blend, with a second constituent which incorporates a water based polymer emulsion. The highly water absorbent cement blend can absorb at least its own mass of water and in some cases five times its own mass of water. The covering material will dry quickly in mines where there is high humidity and little air movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 28/06 (2006.01); C04B 28/16 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C09D (2006.01); E21D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 28/16 (2013.01); C04B 28/065 (2013.01); C04B 2111/0012 (2013.01); C04B 2111/00163 (2013.01); C04B 2111/00482 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C04B 28/065 + C04B 7/02 + C04B 11/05 + C04B 22/10 + C04B 22/10 + C04B 22/126 + C04B 24/2641 + C04B 24/383 + C04B 2103/30 + C04B 2103/50 + C04B 2103/63 + C04B 2103/67
  2. C04B 28/065 + C04B 7/02 + C04B 11/05 + C04B 22/10 + C04B 22/10 + C04B 22/126 + C04B 24/2623 + C04B 24/383 + C04B 2103/30 + C04B 2103/50 + C04B 2103/63 + C04B 2103/67
  3. C04B 28/16 + C04B 7/02 + C04B 7/32 + C04B 22/10 + C04B 22/10 + C04B 22/126 + C04B 24/2641 + C04B 24/383 + C04B 40/0035 + C04B 2103/30 + C04B 2103/44 + C04B 2103/50 + C04B 2103/63 + C04B 2103/67
  4. C04B 28/16 + C04B 7/02 + C04B 7/32 + C04B 14/30 + C04B 22/10 + C04B 22/10 + C04B 22/142 + C04B 24/005 + C04B 24/02 + C04B 24/2623 + C04B 24/383 + C04B 38/02 + C04B 40/065 + C04B 2103/44 + C04B 2103/67

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858886A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858886 A2 19981230; WO 9858886 A3 19990325; AP 200001737 D0 20000331; AU 8539998 A 19990104; BR 9810446 A 20010619; CA 2241167 A1 19981220; CN 1261392 A 20000726; EA 001141 B1 20001030; EA 200000056 A1 20000828; EP 1005441 A2 20000607; PL 337830 A1 20000911; TR 9903130 T2 20000421; ZA 9805350 B 19991220

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-08-08 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2001-06-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010430

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE