Global Patent Index - EP 1005512 A1

EP 1005512 A1 2000-06-07 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MULTILAYER COATINGS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING MULTILAYER COATINGS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRSCHICHTIGEN ÜBERZÜGEN

Title (fr)

MODE DE FABRICATION DE REVETEMENTS A COUCHES MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 1005512 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939649 A

Priority

  • DE 19736535 A
  • EP 9804802 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736535C1] Base coat lacquer contains a binder mixture of (a) dispersion of an acrylate polymer of 30-60 wt.% 1-8 carbon (C) alkyl (meth)acrylate, 30-60 wt.% vinyl-aromatic monomer and 0.5-10 wt.% (meth)acrylic acid; (b) a dispersion of a polymer obtained by free radical polymerisation in aqueous dispersion of (b-1) a polyurethane resin with a number average molecular weight Mn of 1000-30000 and average of 0.05-1.1 polymerisable double bonds per molecule with (b-2) ethylenically unsaturated monomer(s) in 1:30 to 10:1 weight ratio in the presence of water-insoluble initiator(s); and (iii) a rheological additive, which is a synthetic polymer with ionic and/or associative groups. The proportions used are 10-80 wt.% (a) and 20-90 wt.% (b). Also claimed is a method of producing a multi-layer coating on a substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 151/08; B05D 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/36 (2006.01); C09D 7/12 (2006.01); C09D 125/14 (2006.01); C09D 133/06 (2006.01); C09D 151/08 (2006.01); C09D 175/14 (2006.01); C08L 51/08 (2006.01); C08L 75/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 175/14 (2013.01); C09D 125/14 (2013.01); C09D 133/064 (2013.01); C09D 151/08 (2013.01); C08L 51/08 (2013.01); C08L 75/14 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C09D 125/14 + C08L 2666/02
  2. C09D 133/064 + C08L 2666/02
  3. C09D 151/08 + C08L 2666/14
  4. C09D 151/08 + C08L 2666/02

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910439A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736535 C1 19990128; AU 8808398 A 19990316; BR 9811957 A 20000815; BR 9811957 B1 20081118; CA 2296253 A1 19990304; CA 2296253 C 20061212; EP 1005512 A1 20000607; EP 1005512 B1 20020925; ES 2184314 T3 20030401; JP 2001514297 A 20010911; JP 4084924 B2 20080430; US 6607788 B1 20030819; WO 9910439 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-24 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070906

2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030731

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BASF COATINGS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184314 T3

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805729 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011206

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000114

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT