Global Patent Index - EP 1005522 A1

EP 1005522 A1 2000-06-07 - PROCESS FOR MAKING A LOW DENSITY DETERGENT COMPOSITION BY CONTROLLING NOZZLE HEIGHT IN A FLUID BED DRYER

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR MAKING A LOW DENSITY DETERGENT COMPOSITION BY CONTROLLING NOZZLE HEIGHT IN A FLUID BED DRYER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WASCHMITTELN MIT NIEDRIGER SCHÜTTDICHTE DURCH KONTROLLE DER DÜSENHÖHE IM FLIESSBETT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DETERGENTE DE FAIBLE DENSITE PAR COMMANDE DE LA HAUTEUR DE LA BUSE D'UN SECHOIR A LIT FLUIDE

Publication

EP 1005522 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98935559 A

Priority

  • US 9814100 W
  • US 5247297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903966A1] A process for preparing low density detergent agglomerates having a density in a range from about 300 g/l to about 550 g/l is provided. The process involves the steps of: (a) agglomerating a detergent surfactant paste or precursor thereof and dry starting detergent material in a first high speed mixer to obtain agglomerates; (b) mixing the agglomerates in a second high speed mixer to obtain built-up agglomerates; and (c) feeding the built-up agglomerates into a fluid bed dryer in which a binder is sprayed via a nozzle having a height of from about 25 cm to about 60 cm from the distributor plate of the fluid bed dryer such that the built-up agglomerate are dried and agglomerated to form the desired low detergent agglomerates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 11/00; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 11/02 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/0088 (2013.01); C11D 11/0082 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903966A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903966 A1 19990128; AR 016330 A1 20010704; AT 278765 T 20041015; BR 9810716 A 20000808; CA 2295941 A1 19990128; CA 2295941 C 20030422; CN 1170918 C 20041013; CN 1269824 A 20001011; DE 69826871 D1 20041111; DE 69826871 T2 20060309; EP 1005522 A1 20000607; EP 1005522 B1 20041006; ES 2230707 T3 20050501; JP 2003521548 A 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070708

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060710

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *PROCTER & GAMBLE CY

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060710

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060708

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060708

2006-04-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050715

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-07-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-07-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230707 T3

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826871 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030225

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE