Global Patent Index - EP 1005552 A1

EP 1005552 A1 2000-06-07 - MEMBER OF THE HEMATOPOIETIN RECEPTOR SUPERFAMILY

Title (en)

MEMBER OF THE HEMATOPOIETIN RECEPTOR SUPERFAMILY

Title (de)

MITGLIED DER HÄMATOPOIETIN-REZEPTOR SUPERFAMILIE

Title (fr)

MEMBRE DE LA SUPERFAMILLE DES RECEPTEURS D'HEMATOPOIETINE

Publication

EP 1005552 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98901207 A

Priority

  • US 9800334 W
  • US 78486397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9831811A1] Polynucleotides encoding the U4 hematopoietin receptor superfamily chain and fragments thereof are disclosed. U4 proteins and methods for their production are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/19; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/715; C07K 16/18; C12N 15/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/19 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/715 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9831811A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9831811 A1 19980723; AU 5733898 A 19980807; EP 1005552 A1 20000607; JP 2001508309 A 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENETICS INSTITUTE, LLC

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DONALDSON, DEBRA, D.

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COLLINS, MARY

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NEBEN, TAMLYN

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WHITTERS, MATTHEW

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990816

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE