Global Patent Index - EP 1005578 A1

EP 1005578 A1 2000-06-07 - PHOSPHATING METHOD ACCELERATED BY N-OXIDES

Title (en)

PHOSPHATING METHOD ACCELERATED BY N-OXIDES

Title (de)

MIT N-OXIDEN BESCHLEUNIGTES PHOSPHATIERVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PHOSPHATATION ACCELERE PAR N-OXYDES

Publication

EP 1005578 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943785 A

Priority

  • DE 19733978 A
  • DE 19750301 A
  • EP 9804669 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907916A1] The invention relates to an acidic aqueous phosphating solution, containing 0.2 to 3g/l zinc ions, 3 to 50g/l phosphate ions, calculated as PO4<3->, and 0.05 to 4 g/l of an organic N-oxide. The N-oxide is preferably chosen from the N-oxides of substituted or non-substituted pyridines and morpholines, especially from pyridine-N-oxide, 2-methylpyridine-N-oxide, 4-methylpyridine-N-oxide, morpholine-N-oxide and N-methylmorpholine-N-oxide. The phosphating solution contains a co-accelerator; preferably chlorate, hydrogen peroxide, nitroguanidine and/or m-nitrobenzol sulfonate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/12; C23C 22/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/12 (2006.01); C23C 22/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/364 (2013.01); C23C 22/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907916A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907916 A1 19990218; AU 9156398 A 19990301; CA 2300276 A1 19990218; EP 1005578 A1 20000607; EP 1005578 B1 20021009; ES 2185213 T3 20030416; US 6379474 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140725

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140725

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185213 T3

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805918 20021114

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000129

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT