Global Patent Index - EP 1005587 A1

EP 1005587 A1 2000-06-07 - SUSPENSION EQUALIZER

Title (en)

SUSPENSION EQUALIZER

Title (de)

SUSPENSIONSEGALISATOR

Title (fr)

EGALISEUR DE SUSPENSION

Publication

EP 1005587 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939914 A

Priority

  • DE 9901803 W
  • DE 29811054 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9967460A1] A feed line (10) for supplying a suspension in the distribution system (20) of the stock flow (30) of a paper machine is provided with a supsension equalizer (40) arranged upstream from the distribution system (20) and connected thereto by means of a straight feed piece. The suspension equalizer acts as a turbulence generator, whereby it sets the suspension into a state of turbulence with such force that the suspension is homogenized and the acceleration profile of the suspension is equalled out inside the cross-section of the feed line. This also enables optimum stock flow conditions to be created directly prior to the stock flow or even with relatively long feed lines running through windings or curves in order to meet the quality requirements for paper production. In one preferred embodiment, the turbulence generator consists of a tube section that is similar in shape to a venturi tube with an abruptly reduced cross section (42), followed by a gradual expansion of said cross section (45).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02; D21F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/00 (2006.01); D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/0018 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967460A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811054 U1 19980917; AT 230045 T 20030115; EP 1005587 A1 20000607; EP 1005587 B1 20021218; TR 200000485 T1 20001121; WO 9967460 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2006-03-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEBR. *BELLMER G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G. MASCHINENFABRIK

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KEIL GEORG-INGO

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-06-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-05-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-03-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903822 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903822 P 20030130

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230045 T 20030115

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011220

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE