Global Patent Index - EP 1005591 A1

EP 1005591 A1 2000-06-07 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE OFFSHORE INSTALLATION OF MULTI-TON PACKAGES SUCH AS DECK PACKAGES AND JACKETS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE OFFSHORE INSTALLATION OF MULTI-TON PACKAGES SUCH AS DECK PACKAGES AND JACKETS

Title (de)

METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE OFFSHOREINSTALLATION VON SCHWERLASTEN WIE DECKAUFBAUTEN UND TRAGSTRUKTUREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR L'INSTALLATION OFFSHORE D'ENSEMBLES DE PLUSIEURS TONNES TELS QUE DES ENSEMBLES PLATE-FORMES PREFABIQUES ET DES TREILLIS

Publication

EP 1005591 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944478 A

Priority

  • US 9817367 W
  • US 91561797 A
  • US 91592597 A
  • US 92592997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909260A1] A method and apparatus for the installation or removal of large multi-ton prefabricated deck packages (17) includes the use of usually two barges (11, 12) defining a base (13, 14) that can support a large multi-ton load. A variable dimensional truss assembly is supported by the barge and forms a load transfer interface between the barge (13, 14) and the deck package (17). Each boom (21, 22) has a lifting end portion (56) with a roller (63) that fits a receptacle (70) on the package (17). Tensile connections form attachments between the deck package and barge at a lower elevational position. The variable dimension truss includes at least one member (42) of variable length in the preferred embodiment being a winch powered cable (42) that can be extended and retracted by winding and unwinding the winch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 9/06 (2006.01); B63B 27/10 (2006.01); B63B 27/16 (2006.01); B63B 35/00 (2006.01); B63C 7/02 (2006.01); E02B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 27/36 (2013.01); B63B 9/065 (2013.01); B63B 27/02 (2013.01); B63B 27/10 (2013.01); B63B 35/003 (2013.01); B63C 7/02 (2013.01); E02B 17/00 (2013.01); E02B 2017/0047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909260 A1 19990225; AU 9201298 A 19990308; AU 9202198 A 19990308; DE 69835291 D1 20060831; DE 69836221 D1 20061130; EP 1005591 A1 20000607; EP 1005591 A4 20030319; EP 1005591 B1 20060719; EP 1005592 A1 20000607; EP 1005592 A4 20030305; EP 1005592 B1 20061018; GB 0002599 D0 20000329; GB 0002603 D0 20000329; GB 2342678 A 20000419; GB 2342678 B 20010919; GB 2342679 A 20000419; GB 2342679 B 20010725; NO 20000802 A 20000218; NO 20000802 D0 20000218; NO 20000803 A 20000218; NO 20000803 D0 20000218; NO 319809 B1 20050919; NO 322516 B1 20061016; WO 9909259 A1 19990225; WO 9909259 A9 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130821

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130821

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120815

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-05-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090301

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070805

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-10-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69835291 P 20060831

2006-08-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB NL SE

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2003-03-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 02B 17/00 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63B 35/00 B

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB NL SE