Global Patent Index - EP 1005596 A1

EP 1005596 A1 2000-06-07 - ROOF AND WALL CLADDING

Title (en)

ROOF AND WALL CLADDING

Title (de)

DACH- UND WANDABDECKUNG

Title (fr)

REVETEMENTS POUR TOITURE ET MUR

Publication

EP 1005596 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939561 A

Priority

  • EP 9803980 W
  • GB 9717484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909270A1] Pipe sections or external roof or wall cladding are formed of bonded man-made vitreous fibre batts wherein the fibres have a viscosity at 1400 DEG C of 10 to 170 poise and a dissolution rate at pH 4.5 of at least 20 nm per day.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/35; E04B 1/80; E04C 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 13/06 (2006.01); D01F 9/08 (2006.01); E04B 1/80 (2006.01); E04C 2/16 (2006.01); E04D 3/35 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/351 (2013.01); C03C 13/06 (2013.01); E04B 1/80 (2013.01); E04C 2/16 (2013.01); C03C 2213/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909270A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909270 A1 19990225; AU 8802798 A 19990308; CA 2301261 A1 19990225; CN 1267349 A 20000920; EP 1005596 A1 20000607; GB 9717484 D0 19971022; HR P980452 A2 19990630; HU 0003506 A2 20010628; HU 0003506 A3 20040428; JP 2003517409 A 20030527; PL 338834 A1 20001120; SK 1882000 A3 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020624

2001-08-01 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 20010602 0100 ROCKWOOL ROCKPANEL B.V. * 20010602 0200 ROCKDELTA A/S * 20010602 0300 LAPINUS FIBRES B.V. * 20010602 0400 ROCKWOOL/GRODAN B.V.

2000-07-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000208;LV PAYMENT 20000208;RO PAYMENT 20000208;SI PAYMENT 20000208