Global patent index - EP 1005597 A1

EP 1005597 A1 2000-06-07 - FOOTING DEVICE FOR WALKING ON A ROOF

Title (en)

FOOTING DEVICE FOR WALKING ON A ROOF

Title (de)

DACHTRITT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE MARCHER SUR LE TOIT

Publication

EP 1005597 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98940217 A

Priority

  • DE 29715198 U
  • DE 29800890 U
  • EP 9804337 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910611A1] The invention relates to a device (D) for walking on a roof, consisting of two fixing elements (2) which are located at a distance from one another and can be attached to the roof. In addition, the inventive device has a meshed stepping plate (1) or the like, whereby the fixing element (2) or each of the fixing elements (2) has/have a foot section (16). Said meshed stepping plate (1) can be aligned in a parallel manner with the roof pitch and can be attached in varying angle positions to the foot section (16) or the fixing elements (2). According to the invention, the device has a shape which can be easily assembled in that the meshed stepping plate (1) has two supporting ribs (5) which are situated at a distance from one another and a fixing element (2) which lies opposite the section (6) of the step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910611A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910611 A1 19990304; AT 266133 T 20040515; AU 8861198 A 19990316; EP 1005597 A1 20000607; EP 1005597 B1 20040506

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090713

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090713

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811339

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2003-12-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KLOEBER, JOHANNES

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOFING COMPONENTS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LAFARGE ROOFING COMPONENTS GMBH & CO. KG

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOF SYSTEM COMPONENTS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LAFARGE ROOF SYSTEM COMPONENTS GMBH & CO. KG

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT