Global Patent Index - EP 1005604 A1

EP 1005604 A1 2000-06-07 - ROTARY PISTON MACHINE

Title (en)

ROTARY PISTON MACHINE

Title (de)

DREHKOLBENMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A PISTON ROTATIF

Publication

EP 1005604 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98949923 A

Priority

  • DE 9802428 W
  • DE 19736397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19837729A1] A power part (1) is provided in the housing, connected to a shaft (2) fitted with a drive or driven device. The power part comprises a ball layer (3) limited by a face surface (5) and a basic surface (4), the central point of which is located in the rotary axis of the drive or driven shaft and its diameter corresponds to the inner chamber of the housing. The basic surface (4) of the power part runs vertically to the rotary axis and its face surface (5) is formed by the movement of a straight producing line connected with a point of the rotary axis along a cycloidal guide curve with at least two cycloids.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 3/08 (2013.01); F01C 3/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910626A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837729 A1 19990520; AU 9620398 A 19990316; BR 9811964 A 20000815; CA 2300812 A1 19990304; CA 2300812 C 20070109; CN 1093592 C 20021030; CN 1267355 A 20000920; DE 19881218 D2 20000713; EP 1005604 A1 20000607; EP 1005604 B1 20020731; JP 2001514352 A 20010911; JP 4132660 B2 20080813; WO 9910626 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-07-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2010-07-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-06-23 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20100602

2010-06-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805024

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-05

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARNOLD, FELIX

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ARNOLD, FELIX

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL