Global patent index - EP 1005608 A1

EP 1005608 A1 2000-06-07 - LOAD SETTING DEVICE

Title (en)

LOAD SETTING DEVICE

Title (de)

LASTVERSTELLVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT DE CHARGE

Publication

EP 1005608 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946329 A

Priority

  • DE 19736521 A
  • EP 9805148 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736521A1] A single torsion spring is provided to both close the throttle during normal operation and to permit the engine to run at part-power under emergency conditions, e.g. failure of throttle control system. The throttle valve is mounted on a spindle which has a quadrant gear (4) and throttle opening is controlled a stepper motor gear (4) through reduction gearing (8,9). When the outer end (12) of the throttle spring is against a fixed stop (13), and no torque is being applied to the throttle spindle gear (4) by the motor gear (7) the throttle is partly open. The motor operates a cam (10) attached to the reduction gear (8,9) to move the spring end away from the stop to fully close so the throttle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/02; F02D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2013.01); F02D 11/107 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0277 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910642A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736521 A1 19990225; BR 9811347 A 20000912; EP 1005608 A1 20000607; EP 1005608 B1 20030409; US 6360718 B1 20020326; WO 9910642 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59807892

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090813

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090813

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010907

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB