Global Patent Index - EP 1005610 A1

EP 1005610 A1 2000-06-07 - PRESSURE REGULATING ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

PRESSURE REGULATING ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

DRUCKREGELANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1005610 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945238 A

Priority

  • DE 19736846 A
  • EP 9805147 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736846A1] In a pressure regulating arrangement between a pump and a consumer, in particular between a fuel pump and an internal combustion engine, a pressure reducing amount is branched off from the flow pipe of the pump when a predetermined pressure is exceeded and returned to a reservoir. According to the invention, the pressure regulator (9) is arranged next to the pressure reducing pipe (14), together with a filter (2), forming a modular unit. Preferably, all three connections (inlet (4), flow pipe (7) and pressure reducing connection (15)) are arranged on the same side of a common housing (1). In a particularly advantageous embodiment, all three connections are coaxial, so that mounting errors can be excluded when using a corresponding connection piece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/22 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/22 (2013.01); Y10T 137/2645 (2015.04); Y10T 137/8085 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87362 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910647A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736846 A1 19990304; BR 9811349 A 20000912; CN 1096560 C 20021218; CN 1267360 A 20000920; EP 1005610 A1 20000607; EP 1005610 B1 20030416; ES 2197505 T3 20040101; JP 2001514358 A 20010911; JP 4071934 B2 20080402; US 6269835 B1 20010807; WO 9910647 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807985

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090814

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090813

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090814

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090813

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197505 T3

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807985 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010322

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000205

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB