Global Patent Index - EP 1005621 A1

EP 1005621 A1 2000-06-07 - VENTILATOR FOR WINDOW ELEMENTS

Title (en)

VENTILATOR FOR WINDOW ELEMENTS

Title (de)

BELÜFTUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR FENSTERELEMENTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VENTILLATION POUR ELEMENTS DE FENETRE

Publication

EP 1005621 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97944884 A

Priority

  • DE 19735674 A
  • DE 29714954 U
  • EP 9705077 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909357A1] The invention concerns a ventilator (B) which is installed on a window frame (1) consisting of window elements for the purpose of creating a required self-regulating ventilation dependent on prevailing wind pressure. From a cross-sectional point of view, the profile section (3) is substantially U-shaped and consists of an outer limb (300) and an inner limb (311) which are connected to a cover (302) for spaced installation onto the frame, whereby an air duct (L) constructed between the outer and inner sides of the window elements runs from the ventilation profile section (3) to the window frame (1). A regulating element located inside the air duct (L) can be used to adjust the diameter of the air duct (L) depending on the prevailing wind pressure. Said regulator consists of a movable rolling cylinder (7) which, dependant on wind pressure, can roll from a first end position (E1) revealing a maximum cross-sectional area of the air duct (L) to a second end position (E2) revealing a minimum cross-sectional area of the air duct (L) resulting in said diameter reduction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/04; E06B 7/10; F24F 11/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2006.01); F24F 11/04 (2006.01); F24F 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2013.01); F24F 11/043 (2013.01); F24F 13/18 (2013.01); E06B 7/02 (2013.01); E06B 2007/145 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909357 A1 19990225; AT 258668 T 20040215; AU 4623397 A 19990308; EP 1005621 A1 20000607; EP 1005621 B1 20040128

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59711266

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050917

2005-01-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040909

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-05-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PROFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59711266

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PROFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-10-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KBE PROFILSYSTEME GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021009

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KBE VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT FUER KUNSTSTOFFPRODUKTE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL