Global Patent Index - EP 1005624 A2

EP 1005624 A2 2000-06-07 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REFRIGERATING, ESPECIALLY FREEZING, GOODS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REFRIGERATING, ESPECIALLY FREEZING, GOODS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KÜHLEN, INSBESONDERE GEFRIEREN EINES KÜHLGUTES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REFRIGERER, EN PARTICULIER CONGELER, UN MATERIAU

Publication

EP 1005624 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98949922 A

Priority

  • DE 9802427 W
  • DE 19736372 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736372A1] The device chills a freezer bag (2) between two plates (3, 4) of steel or copper with high heat capacity. A pneumatic cylinder (5) is connected to the top plate (3) by a piston rod (6) to press the top plate against the freezer bag with great force. The plates are chilled in a liquid nitrogen current or by pipes (7) running through the plates feeding liquid nitrogen. Heat transmission within the pipes is increased by coating the pipes' inner surface with a microporous film (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/10 (2006.01); F25D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 31/001 (2013.01); F25D 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910693A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736372 A1 19990225; AU 9620298 A 19990316; DE 19881222 D2 20001026; EP 1005624 A2 20000607; EP 1005624 B1 20020508; US 6393860 B1 20020528; WO 9910693 A2 19990304; WO 9910693 A3 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070820

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070102

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804073 20020613

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-05-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-05-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000214

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL