Global Patent Index - EP 1005660 A1

EP 1005660 A1 2000-06-07 - OPTICAL FIBER LIGHT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE AND ILLUMINATION

Title (en)

OPTICAL FIBER LIGHT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE AND ILLUMINATION

Title (de)

FASEROPTISCHES LICHTVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND BELICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION DE LUMIERE A FIBRES OPTIQUES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET D'ILLUMINATION

Publication

EP 1005660 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904441 A

Priority

  • US 9901962 W
  • US 7302898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939225A1] An optical fiber light distribution system (10) has a first optical fiber and a second optical fiber. The first optical fiber has a side surface, an axis, and a length. The second optical fiber is wrapped about the side surface such that the second optical fiber defines a plurality of wraps (18) about the first optical fiber. The plurality of wraps (18) have a pitch (20a). Pitch (20a) is the distance between corresponding points of adjacent wraps (18) measured parallel to the first optical fiber axis. When light (24) is directed through the first optical fiber, portions of the light are extracted by portions of the second optical fiber that contact the first optical fiber. The lower the pitch of the plurality of wraps (18), the greater the percentage of light extracted into the second optical fiber from the first optical fiber. Further, softer first optical fibers which incur more deformation have increased contact surface with the second optical fiber. The increased contact surface results in an increased percentage of light being extracted into the second optical fiber. Cladding or potting may be used to inhibit light extraction. A process for making the optical fiber distribution system has the step of wrapping the second optical fiber about the first optical fiber. A process for illumination has the step of directing light through the optical fiber light distribution system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 8/00 (2006.01); G02B 6/28 (2006.01); G02B 6/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/001 (2013.01); G02B 6/2852 (2013.01); G02B 6/0001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939225 A1 19990805; EP 1005660 A1 20000607; EP 1005660 A4 20000927

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070606

2007-09-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028442

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050421

2000-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 8/00 A

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE