Global Patent Index - EP 1005693 A2

EP 1005693 A2 2000-06-07 - ULTRASONIC CONVERTER WITH A BOARD FOR AN ELECTRIC CIRCUIT ARRANGED IN THE LONGITUDINAL DIRECTION OF THE CONVERTER

Title (en)

ULTRASONIC CONVERTER WITH A BOARD FOR AN ELECTRIC CIRCUIT ARRANGED IN THE LONGITUDINAL DIRECTION OF THE CONVERTER

Title (de)

ULTRASCHALLWANDLER MIT IN WANDLERLÄNGSRICHTUNG ANGEORDNETER PLATINE FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

TRANSDUCTEUR ULTRASONORE COMPORTANT UNE PLATINE MONTEE DANS LE SENS LONGITUDINAL DUDIT TRANSDUCTEUR, POUR UN CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1005693 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98948834 A

Priority

  • DE 19736753 A
  • DE 19835782 A
  • EP 9805171 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910875A2] The invention concerns an ultrasonic converter. The object of the invention is to provide a novel wiring and connection technique for such a converter. This object is attained by a novel arrangement of the electric circuitry and by the use of flexible electroconducting foils (50) for connecting the electric components (57, 87) and for creating a novel cable outlet for ultrasonic converters. Advantageous developments concern the connection of the electric circuit (57) to the flexible conducting foils, and the use of such conducting foils (50) as cable looms for interconnecting the converters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910875A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910875 A2 19990304; WO 9910875 A3 19990506; EP 1005693 A2 20000607; EP 1005693 B1 20030212; ES 2188018 T3 20030616

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140815

2015-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150925

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188018 T3

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807198 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011012

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT