Global Patent Index - EP 1005716 A1

EP 1005716 A1 2000-06-07 - SEPARATELY EXCITED ELECTRIC MACHINE

Title (en)

SEPARATELY EXCITED ELECTRIC MACHINE

Title (de)

FREMDERREGTE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE

Title (fr)

MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE A EXCITATION INDEPENDANTE

Publication

EP 1005716 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942594 A

Priority

  • DE 29714604 U
  • DE 29716812 U
  • EP 9804594 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6366037B1] A separately excited electric machine has a rotor and a stator and a device for detecting the rotational position of the rotor relative to the stator. A position determination device is provided for determination of the rotational position by evaluation of a signal which can be tapped at the pole winding circuit and is imprinted by pole winding inductivities exhibiting rotational position dependency. The pole winding circuit has phase strands that are star-connected, and the position determination device is provided for evaluating the potential at the star point during motor operation of the machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02P 6/18; H02K 29/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 29/00 (2006.01); H02K 29/12 (2006.01); H02P 6/16 (2006.01); H02P 6/18 (2006.01); H02K 1/27 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 29/12 (2013.01); H02P 6/185 (2013.01); H02K 1/2786 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909645A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6366037 B1 20020402; AU 9067598 A 19990308; EP 1005716 A1 20000607; EP 1005716 B1 20011114; ES 2166185 T3 20020401; JP 2001516198 A 20010925; WO 9909645 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160701

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802162

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802162

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT M, DE

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166185 T3

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802162 20011220

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT