Global Patent Index - EP 1005735 A1

EP 1005735 A1 2000-06-07 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSESSING THE SERVICE QUALITY OF TRANSMISSION CHANNELS IN A DIGITAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSESSING THE SERVICE QUALITY OF TRANSMISSION CHANNELS IN A DIGITAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ABSCHÄTZUNG DER DIENSTQUALITÄT AUF ÜBERTRAGUNGSKANÄLEN IN EINEM DIGITALEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EVALUATION DE LA QUALITE DE SERVICE SUR DES CANAUX DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1005735 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945070 A

Priority

  • DE 9802172 W
  • DE 19736653 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736653C1] The method involves estimating the service quality on the transmission channels in a digital transmission system, in which a turbo-encoding is performed for a channel encoding in a turbo-encoder at the transmitter side. A turbo-decoding, with soft-decision output signals, is performed in a turbo-decoder at the receiver side. The service quality is determined from the variance of the soft-decision output signals at the receiver side, preferably through a soft-input/soft-output symbol or sequence estimator, by using a detected bit error rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03M 13/13 (2006.01); H03M 13/29 (2006.01); H03M 13/35 (2006.01); H03M 13/41 (2006.01); H03M 13/45 (2006.01); H04L 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 1/20 (2013.01); H03M 13/2957 (2013.01); H03M 13/2975 (2013.01); H03M 13/299 (2013.01); H03M 13/353 (2013.01); H03M 13/6381 (2013.01); H04L 1/005 (2013.01); H04L 1/0066 (2013.01); H04L 1/0068 (2013.01); H03M 13/3738 (2013.01); H04L 1/0041 (2013.01); H04L 1/0059 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911013A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736653 C1 19981210; AU 9253498 A 19990316; BR 9811918 A 20000815; CA 2300880 A1 19990304; CN 1268268 A 20000927; EP 1005735 A1 20000607; EP 1005735 B1 20050518; JP 2001514459 A 20010911; RU 2202153 C2 20030410; US 6629286 B1 20030930; WO 9911013 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110729

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110729

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090212 AND 20090218

2008-10-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FI FR GB SE

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-03-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FI FR GB SE

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE