Global Patent Index - EP 1005753 A1

EP 1005753 A1 2000-06-07 - CARD PHONES COMPRISING AN ACCESS PROGRAMME TO VARIOUS FACILITIES

Title (en)

CARD PHONES COMPRISING AN ACCESS PROGRAMME TO VARIOUS FACILITIES

Title (de)

KARTENTELEFON MIT ZUGRIFFSTEUERUNGSMITTELN AUF VERSCHIEDENE FUNKTIONALITÄTEN

Title (fr)

TELEPHONE A CARTES COMPRENANT UN PROGRAMME D'ACCES A DIVERSES FONCTIONNALITES

Publication

EP 1005753 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98941562 A

Priority

  • FR 9801763 W
  • FR 9710587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2767621A1] The card operated telephone has a key pad and a programmable memory. The programmable memory contains an access program which after entry of a secret code allows access to supplementary telephone functions, such as communication without card, display of counters, programming of fast dialing keys and changing of secret access code. The supplementary functions are accessed by pressing nominated keys then entering the secret code at the key pad.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 17/02; H04M 1/27; H04M 1/66; H04M 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/28 (2006.01); H04M 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 17/02 (2013.01); H04M 15/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911052A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2767621 A1 19990226; FR 2767621 B1 19991008; EP 1005753 A1 20000607; WO 9911052 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMES

2004-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AXALTO S.A.

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT NL