Global patent index - EP 1005801 A2

EP 1005801 A2 2000-06-07 - Fastener with fitting means for fastening shoes or the like

Title (en)

Fastener with fitting means for fastening shoes or the like

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtung mit Beschlagmittel für Schuhe oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage avec moyens de raccord pour chaussures ou analogues

Publication

EP 1005801 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123358 A

Priority

IT VR980101 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention proposes to realize hooking elements which permit to accomplish the closing and opening operations with an only manoeuvre of the fingers and even with an only hand. In this way, it is possible to rapidly lace and unlace the shoes. Moreover, the said hooking elements permit both a keeping and a contemporaneous bending in the sense of lacing the shoe in such a way as to permit the foot to be bent. Thus, the foot may in general enjoy a greater comfort. Essentially, a fastener (1) is formed by two fixed parts (2, 3), each part being fixed on a respective flap to be closed with the other flap, and a hooking element (4) which represents the means on which it is possible to act in order to lace or unlace a shoe or the like. The hooking element (4) is connected through elastic elements (10) or the like with one (3) of the two fixed parts and is hooked through bayonet or pivot means to the other fixed part (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 11/14 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A43C (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 1/00 (2013.01); A43C 11/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005801 A2 20000607; EP 1005801 A3 20020213; IT 1304222 B1 20010313; IT VR980101 A1 20000601

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-12-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI