Global Patent Index - EP 1005802 A2

EP 1005802 A2 2000-06-07 - Shoe stretcher

Title (en)

Shoe stretcher

Title (de)

Schuhspanner

Title (fr)

Embauchoir

Publication

EP 1005802 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123613 A

Priority

IT MI980783 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention refers to a shoe stretcher comprising a toe piece (1) and a heel piece (2) pivoting with respect to each other and set at an adjustable distance, characterized in that the adjustment of their reciprocal distance is achieved by a small sliding board (3) tied to the heel piece (2) and hinged to the toe piece; and in that said small sliding board (3) is actuated by a combination of worm screw and wheel (4, 5) engaging a rack (6) firmly attached to the small sliding board (3), where said worm screw (4) is controlled from the top of the heel piece (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43D 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43D 3/14 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A43B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43D 3/1475 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005802 A2 20000607; EP 1005802 A3 20020123; IT 244416 Y1 20020311; IT MI980783 U1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-11-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI