Global Patent Index - EP 1005807 A2

EP 1005807 A2 2000-06-07 - Method for manufacture of sticks

Title (en)

Method for manufacture of sticks

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Stiftes

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de batonnets

Publication

EP 1005807 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121505 A

Priority

DE 19855210 A

Abstract (en)

The tip holder (16) is inserted into an injection mold, the material injected and after having become rigid, the tip holder is screwed into the main holding element (12). The inner thread (28) breaks off and stays connected with the main holding element. The stick comprises a colored tip (22) accommodated with one end in a specific holding element (16) with an outer thread (18), and a shaft (10), movable joined to the main holding element (12). The main holding element has an inner thread (28), matching the outer thread of the tip holding element and positioned above a predetermined breaking point (26). The tip holder is inserted into an injection mold, the material injected and after having become rigid, the tip holder is screwed into the main holding element. The inner thread breaks off and stays connected with the main holding element.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Stiftes beschrieben, mit einer ersten Hülse, einer zweiten Hülse mit einem Einsteckabschnitt zum Einstecken in die erste Hülse, wobei die beiden Hülsen in eingestecktem Zustand gegeneinander verdrehbar sind, einem Außengewindeelement, das drehfest, aber axial verschieblich mit der zweiten Hülse gekoppelt ist und dazu ausgelegt ist, mit einem drehfest mit der ersten Hülse gekoppelten Innengewindeelement zu kämmen, so daß ein Verdrehen der beiden Hülsen gegeneinander zu einer Axialverschiebung des Außengewindeelements bezüglich der Hülsen führt, und einer Mine, die bei entsprechender Axialverschiebung des Außengewindeelements infolge Verdrehens der beiden Hülsen gegeneinander aus einer Hülsenöffnung herausgeschoben wird. Erfindungsgemäß werden die zweite Hülse und das Innengewindeelement als miteinander verbundene Teile in die erste Hülse eingesteckt, wobei die Verbindung der zweiten Hülse mit dem Innengewindeelement derart ist, daß sie bei einem Verdrehen der Hülsen gegeneinander gelöst wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/06 (2006.01); A45D 40/04 (2006.01); A45D 40/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/16 (2013.01); A45D 40/04 (2013.01); A45D 2040/0043 (2013.01); A45D 2040/005 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4979 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4984 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49904 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49984 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1005807 A2 20000607; EP 1005807 A3 20040506; EP 1005807 B1 20060104; DE 19855210 A1 20000608; DE 19855210 C2 20001123; DE 59913017 D1 20060330; ES 2253856 T3 20060601; JP 2000166646 A 20000620; JP 3355164 B2 20021209; US 6206597 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071019

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071001

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071008

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2253856

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060410

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913017

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-03-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-01-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2005-01-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040408

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHWAN-STABILO COSMETICS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI